Hurst, Lorne Douglas Campbell (CPSO#: 63063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1602 Medical Arts Building
233 Kennedy Street
Winnipeg MB  R3C 3J5
Phone: (204) 942-4808
Fax: (204) 956-0587
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences Centre
820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB  R3E 0W3
Canada
Phone: (204) 787-3121
Fax: (204) 787-7086
County: 
Electoral District: 

Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-9861 Ext. 2287
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 09 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNE DOUGLAS CAMPBELL HURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1991