Husain, Amna Fatima (CPSO#: 58439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: Daudi, Amna (used until: 20 Jun 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Urdu

Education:University of Alberta, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Temmy Latner Centre
for Palliative Care
Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray St., 4th floor, L4-000
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7884
Fax: (416) 586-4804
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Husain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Husain ( CPSO# 58439 )
Dr. M. Husain ( CPSO# 57388 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
1NU-119 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3188

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
5-403 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-4800

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
201 - 294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone Number: (416) 901-2088

Business Address:
MyHealth Centre
229 Broadway
Unit 1
Orangeville ON  L9W 1K4
Phone Number: (519) 943-0022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMNA FATIMA HUSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1988