Hussain, Ayesha (CPSO#: 77860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 621-9700
Fax: (416) 621-4438
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayesha Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hussain ( CPSO# 77860 )

Business Address:
211 - 190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 621-9700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AYESHA HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2004