Hussain, Shabnam (CPSO#: 60204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Smyth Medical Centre
Suite 200
1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone: (613) 249-0803
Fax: (613) 249-0804
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shabnam Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hussain ( CPSO# 60204 )

Business Address:
Smyth Medical Centre
200 - 1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone Number: (613) 249-0803

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHABNAM HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1990