Hussain, Yasmine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 82410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 117
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone: (905) 845-8884
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Hasanee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hasanee ( CPSO# 74676 )
Dr. Y. Hussain ( CPSO# 82410 )

Business Address:
826 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1L6
Phone Number: (905) 549-6123

Business Address:
3497 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7N 2R4
Phone Number: (905) 681-6809

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASMINE ELIZABETH HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2007