Hussein, Naushad (CPSO#: 50811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 127
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S2
Phone: 1 855 393 2565
Fax: 855 393 2565
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 403
421 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3T1
Canada
Phone: 1 855 393 2565
Fax: 855 393 2565
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naushad Hussein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hussein ( CPSO# 50811 )

Business Address:
403 - 421 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3T1
Phone Number: (855) 393-2565

Business Address:
Suite 127
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S2
Phone Number: (855) 393-2565

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAUSHAD HUSSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1986