Hussein, Sohaileh (CPSO#: 63977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
506 Trethewey Drive
North York ON  M6M 4C2
Phone: (416) 244-5210
Fax: (416) 244-5208
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sohaileh Hussein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hussein ( CPSO# 63977 )

Business Address:
Trethewey Medical Clinic
506 Tretheway Drive
North York ON  M6M 4C2
Phone Number: (416) 244-5210

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOHAILEH HUSSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1992