Hussey, Andrew Alford (CPSO#: 29422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Jenny Trout Centre
201-342 Erie Street
Stratford ON  N5A 2N4
Phone: (519) 271-7900
Fax: (519) 271-2830
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew A. Hussey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hussey ( CPSO# 29422 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
342 Erie Street
Stratford ON  N5A 2N4
Phone Number: (519) 271-7900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW ALFORD HUSSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977