Hussman, Miriam Ruth (CPSO#: 59684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 466-4290
Fax: (416) 466-4393
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Strauss ( CPSO# 65556 )
Dr. M. Hussman ( CPSO# 59684 )

Business Address:
235 Danforth Avenue
Suite 402
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 466-4290

Business Address:
301 - 10 Unionville Gate
Markham ON  L3R 0W7
Phone Number: (905) 475-3121

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRIAM RUTH HUSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1989