Hutchinson-Jaffe, Adam Bernard (CPSO#: 88345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Fairview Mall Dr.
Suite 108A
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (647) 350-3332
Fax: (647) 350-3334
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Hutchinson-Jaffe & Song Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Song ( CPSO# 88576 )
Dr. A. Hutchinson-Jaffe ( CPSO# 88345 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
4 Cardinal Carter
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Business Address:
108A - 5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM BERNARD HUTCHINSON-JAFFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHINSON-JAFFE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012