Hutnik, Cindy Mary-Lynn (CPSO#: 68179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Health Care
Eye Clinic
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6272
Fax: (519) 646-6410
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hutnik St. Amand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2014


Corporation Name: Cindy Hutnik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hutnik ( CPSO# 68179 )

Business Address:
Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Health Care
Eye Clinic
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDY MARY-LYNN HUTNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTNIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999