Hwang, David Muren (CPSO#: 74726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of LMMD
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4009
Fax: (416) 480-4271
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David M. Hwang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hwang ( CPSO# 74726 )

Business Address:
Department of LMMD
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite E432
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4009

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MUREN HWANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HWANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004