Hwang, David Wei-De (CPSO#: 106151)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Oct 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Eaton North
14th Floor Room 216A
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medicine
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
8EW-432E
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hwang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hwang ( CPSO# 106151)

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
14th Floor, Room 216A
200 Elizabeth Street
Eaton North
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3932

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Oct 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  David  Wei-De  Hwang  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  internal
            medicine.