Hyson, Harvey Christopher (CPSO#: 70546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Mar 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
396 Queens Avenue
London ON  N6B 1X8
Phone: (226) 636-0708
Fax: (888) 550-3266
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Village of Glendale Crossings
3030 Singleton Ave
London ON  N6L 0B6
Canada
Phone: (226) 636-0708
Fax: (888) 550-3266
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

peopleCare Oakcrossing London
1242 Oakcrossing Road
London ON  N6H 0G2
Canada
Phone: (226) 636-0708
Fax: (888) 550-3266
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Chartwell Parkhill LTC
250 Tain Street
Parkhill ON  N0M 2K0
Canada
Phone: 519-294-6342
Fax: 519-294-0107
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Kensington Village LTC
1340 Huron St
London ON  N5V 3R3
Canada
Phone: 519-455-3910
Fax: 519-455-1570
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hyson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hyson ( CPSO# 70546 )

Business Address:
3030 Singleton Avenue
London ON  N6L 0B6
Phone Number: (226) 636-0708

Business Address:
1242 Oakcrossing Road
London ON  N6H 0G2
Phone Number: (226) 636-0708

Business Address:
250 Tain Street
Parkhill ON  N0M 2K0
Phone Number: (519) 294-6342

Business Address:
1340 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 3R3
Phone Number: (519) 455-3910

Business Address:
Unit 105
396 Queens Avenue
London ON  N6B 1X8
Phone Number: (519) 663-3404

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Jan 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Dr. Harvey Christopher Hyson (November 15, 2017) Allegations of Dr. Harvey Christopher Hyson’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee. It is alleged that Dr. Hyson has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice; that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; that he engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician, and that he has failed to maintain the standard of the profession. It is alleged that Dr. Hyson was found guilty of an offence relevant to the practice of medicine when he was was convicted, on December 20, 2016, of stopping his motor vehicle for the purpose of obtaining the sexual services of a prostitute, contrary to Section 213(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada (as it then stood). It is alleged that Dr. Hyson has engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by, among other things: accessing child pornography; possessing child pornography; and communicating with a person or persons who were or whom he believed to be under the age of 18 for the purpose of soliciting or engaging in sexual activity. It is alleged that Dr. Hyson has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or conduct unbecoming a physician in his electronic communications, including by using his professional designations in emails sent for a sexual purpose. It is alleged that Dr. Hyson has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or conduct unbecoming a physician by storing videos of patient encounters on his home computer, alongside child pornography.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 14 Jan 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 14, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Harvey Christopher
            Hyson, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hyson to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. HARVEY CHRISTOPHER HYSON
                                          ("Dr. Hyson")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hyson, certificate of registration number 70546, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Hyson, acknowledge that the College has referred to the Discipline
                  Committee, in the matter of College File Number 7213278, allegations that
                  I have been found guilty of an offence relevant to my suitability to
                  practice, and that I failed to maintain the standard of practice of the
                  profession and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional
                  conduct and/or conduct unbecoming a physician, by, among other things:
                  accessing child pornography; possessing child pornography; communicating
                  with a person or persons who were or whom I believed to be under the age
                  of 18 for the purpose of soliciting or engaging in sexual activity; using
                  professional designations in emails sent for a sexual purpose; and
                  storing videos of patient encounters on my home computer, alongside child
                  pornography. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Hyson, have read the Notice of Hearing dated November 15, 2017,
                  which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Hyson, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking
                  in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time. I
                  acknowledge that this Undertaking supersedes the previous undertaking
                  signed by me on March 12, 2015.

            (6)   I, Dr. Hyson, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR
                  Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (7)   I, Dr. Hyson, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Hyson, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (9)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hyson, undertake to restrict my practice as follows:
                  
                        i.    I shall not see or treat any patients under the age of 21
                              years in any jurisdiction. I undertake to restrict my
                              practise to patients who are 21 years of age and older.
                  
            (10)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hyson, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post a
                        sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms,
                        in all of my Practice Locations, with the exception of any Practice
                        Location which is a nursing home (which is addressed in 11(a)
                        below). The sign shall be posted in a clearly visible and secure
                        location, in the form set out in Appendix "A" that states: "Dr.
                        Hyson must not see or treat any patients under the age of 21 years.
                        Further information may be found on the College website at
                        www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hyson, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (10)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "A."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hyson, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (10)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hyson, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hyson, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (10)(b) prior to providing
                        services in the language(s) described in section (10)(d).
                  
            (11)  Notification

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hyson, undertake to notify the staff at each of my Practice
                        Locations which is a nursing home of my practice restriction by
                        providing a copy of this Undertaking to the management of such
                        Practice Locations. I undertake to ensure that the manager or other
                        person in charge during each of my shifts at a Practice Location
                        which is a nursing home is aware of my practice restriction.
                  
            (12)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hyson, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations, within 48 hours of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hyson, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative and to any other activity the
                        College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the
                        provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hyson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hyson, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Hyson, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Hyson, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any chief(s) of staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities,
                  at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Hyson, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (16)  I, Dr. Hyson, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel
                  in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to
                  do so.

            (17)  I, Dr. Hyson, acknowledge that, in the event of an appeal of any Order of
                  the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (18)  I, Dr. Hyson, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Hyson, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (20)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hyson, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hyson, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (20)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Hyson is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                              Committee into allegations that he has been found guilty of
                              an offence relevant to his suitability to practice, and that
                              he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the
                              profession and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or
                              unprofessional conduct and/or conduct unbecoming a physician,
                              by, among other things: accessing child pornography;
                              possessing child pornography; communicating with a person or
                              persons who were or whom he believed to be under the age of
                              18 for the purpose of soliciting or engaging in sexual
                              activity; using professional designations in emails sent for
                              a sexual purpose; and storing videos of patient encounters on
                              his home computer, alongside child pornography. As a result
                              of the referral:
                  
                              Dr. Hyson must not see or treat any patients under the age of
                              21 years.
                  
                              Dr. Hyson shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination
                              rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, with
                              the exception of any Practice Location which is a nursing
                              home (which is addressed below). The sign shall be posted in
                              a clearly visible and secure location, that states: 
                              
                              "Dr. Hyson must not see or treat any patients under the age
                              of 21 years. Further information may be found on the College
                              website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                              Dr. Hyson shall notify the management of any Practice
                              Location which is a nursing home of his practice restriction.
                  
            C.    CONSENT

            (21)  I, Dr. Hyson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Hyson, give my irrevocable consent to all Chief(s) of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.




Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 14, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Harvey Christopher Hyson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective January 14, 2018:

Dr. Hyson is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations that he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice, and that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or conduct unbecoming a physician, by, among other things: accessing child pornography; possessing child pornography; communicating with a person or persons who were or whom he believed to be under the age of 18 for the purpose of soliciting or engaging in sexual activity; using professional designations in emails sent for a sexual purpose; and storing videos of patient encounters on his home computer, alongside child pornography. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Hyson must not see or treat any patients under the age of 21 years.

Dr. Hyson shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, with the exception of any Practice Location which is a nursing home (which is addressed below). The sign shall be posted in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Hyson must not see or treat any patients under the age of 21 years. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

Dr. Hyson shall notify the management of any Practice Location which is a nursing home of his practice restriction.


Source: Member
Active Date: June 11, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:
Where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require, effective May 29, 2015, certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Harvey Christopher HYSON:

(1) between April 3, 2012 and April 12, 2012, at the City of London, did by means of a computer system within the meaning of s.342.1(2) of the Criminal Code, communicate with a person, namely Detective Dale HOWE, who was or was believed to be under the age of 18 years, for the purpose of facilitating the commission of an offence under s.212(1) or s.212(4) of the Criminal Code with respect to that person, contrary to s.172.1(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada;
(2) between April 3, 2012 and April 12, 2012, at the City of London, did communicate with Detective Dale HOWE for the purpose of obtaining for consideration, the sexual services of a person, namely a person who was believed to be under the age of 18 years, contrary to s.212(4) of the Criminal Code of Canada;
(3) on or about April 20, 2012, at the City of London, did, without lawful excuse, possess child pornography in the form of a picture, contrary to s.163.1(4) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and
(4) on or about April 8, 2012, at the City of London, did without lawful excuse, access child pornography in the form of a digital image contrary to s.163.1(4.1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges 1 and 2: April 13, 2012
Date of indictment (all charges): February 3, 2014
Place of charges: London, ON
London Police Service
Crown Attorney – Middlesex