Imrie, Kevin Robert (CPSO#: 59793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
D474
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4592
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Imrie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Imrie ( CPSO# 59793 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room-D474
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4592

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 19 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN ROBERT IMRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IMRIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1992