Inculet, Richard Ion (CPSO#: 31448)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
Suite E2-122
P O Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6679
Fax: (519) 667-6762
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Inculet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Inculet ( CPSO# 31448 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
Room E2-122
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ION INCULET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INCULET is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1986