Ingles, Julia Anne (CPSO#: 81738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
16 O Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone: (705) 330-4060
Fax: (705) 728-5100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ingles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ingles ( CPSO# 81738 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
16 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone Number: (705) 330-4060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA ANNE INGLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INGLES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Aug 2004 to 21 Aug 2004
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2006