Iocca, Angelo John (CPSO#: 66621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Court Medical Centre
Suite 206
1 Quarry Ridge
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 792-6796
Fax: (705) 792-6890
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angelo J. Iocca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Iocca ( CPSO# 66621 )

Business Address:
Royal Court Medical Centre
206 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 792-6796

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELO JOHN IOCCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IOCCA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998