Irons, Shawna Marie (CPSO#: 86781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Village Family Health Team
171 East Liberty Street
Unit 102
Toronto
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone: (416) 599-8348
Fax: (416) 599-2001
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 The Queensway
Toronto
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6860
Fax: (416) 530-6160
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWNA MARIE IRONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRONS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010