Iseman, Wendy Ellen (CPSO#: 59052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 church st
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905)4727003
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UnionVille Home Society
4300 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3R 1L8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wendy Iseman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Iseman ( CPSO# 59052 )

Business Address:
Unionville Home Society
4300 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3R 1L8
Phone Number: (905) 472-2822

Business Address:
Cedarvale Terrace
429 Walmer Road
Toronto ON  M5P 2X9
Phone Number: (416) 967-6949

Business Address:
Baycrest Nursing Home
3550 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY ELLEN ISEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISEMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1987