Islur, Mruthyunjayappa (CPSO#: 22070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada

Education:Mysore University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
99 firvalley court
Toronto ON  M1L 1P2
Phone: (416)694 7400
Fax: (416) 291-1969
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1018 Pape ave
Toronto ON  M4K 3V9
Canada
Phone: 416 429 6668
Fax: 416 291 1969
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Website: www.recordsregistry,ca
Date Received: 16 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MRUTHYUNJAYAPPA ISLUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISLUR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1969