Iu, Simon Chin Man (CPSO#: 50839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: Iu, Chin Man (used until: 19 Jun 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 506
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 221-1233
Fax: (416) 221-7873
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Simon Iu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Iu ( CPSO# 50839 )

Business Address:
506 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 221-1233

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON CHIN MAN IU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1987