Iyengar, Pratibha (CPSO#: 73379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Medicine
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2696
Fax: (905) 813-4132
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Gamma-Dynacare Medical Laboratories
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-3000
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pratibha Iyengar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Iyengar ( CPSO# 73379 )

Business Address:
Department of Laboratory Medicine
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRATIBHA IYENGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IYENGAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2005