Mendes, Joao Manuel (CPSO#: 52528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone: 905-265-8505
Fax: 905-265-0273
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rutherford Pediatric Walk In Clinic
Unit 3
5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T2
Canada
Phone: (905) 264-8311
Fax: (905) 264-0801
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mendes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mendes ( CPSO# 52528 )
Dr. A. Di Maria ( CPSO# 53848 )

Business Address:
305 - 8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone Number: (905) 265-8505

Business Address:
Rutherford Pediatric Walk In Clinic
3 - 5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T2
Phone Number: (905) 264-8311

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOAO MANUEL MENDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1984