Jabbar, Yasmeen (CPSO#: 82008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone: (905) 873-3000
Fax: (905) 873-0800
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

17 King's Cross
Brampton ON  L6T 3V5
Canada
Phone: (905) 799-9144
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Jabbar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Jabbar ( CPSO# 82008 )

Business Address:
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone Number: (905) 873-3000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Oct 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASMEEN JABBAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABBAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2004 to 22 Jan 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2005 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006