Jabbour, Mona (CPSO#: 58017)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hosp of Eastern Ontario
Division Of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3299
Fax: (613) 738-4825
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mona Jabbour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jabbour ( CPSO# 58017 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONA JABBOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABBOUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1988