Jaberi, Arash (CPSO#: 93073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3111
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5801
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 596-4200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arash Jaberi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jaberi ( CPSO# 93073 )

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3111

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5801

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARASH JABERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABERI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015