Jackiewicz, Allan Wojciech (CPSO#: 51975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jan 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. & G. Jackiewicz, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jackiewicz ( CPSO# 51975 )
Dr. G. Jackiewicz ( CPSO# 60305 )

Business Address:
Stamford Medical Centre
4256 Portage Road
Suite 306
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A4
Phone Number: (905) 374-0781

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 27, 2014
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 10, 2014, Niagara Health System notified the College that Dr. Allan Jackiewicz' s hospital privileges were restricted, effective May 27, 2014.

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  January 17, 2014
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On January 20, 2014, Niagara Health System notified the College that Dr. Alan W. Jackiewicz's gynaecological privileges were suspended, effective January 17, 2014.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 22 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 21 Oct 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Jackiewicz’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Jackiewicz is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Hearing Dates: April 4-6, 24-27, 30, and May 1, 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., October 21, 2017, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Allan Wojciech Jackiewicz:

            Practice Restrictions

            1.    Dr. Jackiewicz's practice shall be restricted to an office-based
                  gynaecological practice in which no procedures performed require the
                  administration of anesthesia, including local anesthesia, and he will
                  cease to engage in surgery.

            Clinical Supervision 

            2.    Dr. Jackiewicz shall, by January 9, 2017, at his own expense, engage a
                  clinical supervisor acceptable to the College who will supervise Dr.
                  Jackiewicz's gynaecological office practice and who will sign an
                  undertaking.

            3.    Dr. Jackiewicz shall meet with the Clinical Supervisor once every month
                  to conduct a review of patient charts.  The Clinical Supervisor shall
                  select and review all colposcopic cases seen by Dr. Jackiewicz in the
                  preceding month, as well as an additional ten (10) patient charts,
                  discuss with Dr. Jackiewicz his patient care, treatment plans and
                  follow-up, identify any issues or concerns regarding the care, treatment
                  plans and follow-up and make recommendations for improvement. 

            4.    The Clinical Supervisor shall provide reports to the College once every
                  month for the first three (3) months, and thereafter once every three (3)
                  months, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has concerns
                  about Dr. Jackiewicz's standard of practice.  The reports shall contain
                  reasonable detail, including all information to assist the College in
                  evaluating Dr. Jackiewicz's standard of practice, as well as his
                  participation in and compliance with the requirements set out in this
                  Order;

            5.    Dr. Jackiewicz shall fully cooperate with and abide by the
                  recommendations of his Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to,
                  any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional
                  development.  For greater certainty, and without limiting the foregoing,
                  if during or after a chart review the Clinical Supervisor is of the view
                  that any conduct or care on Dr. Jackiewicz's part will put a patient or
                  patients at risk, Dr. Jackiewicz shall immediately comply with any
                  recommendations made by the Clinical Supervisor to protect the patient(s)
                  from risk;

            6.    Dr. Jackiewicz shall maintain an up-to-date log (the "Patient Log")
                  listing every patient seen by him in his gynaecological office practice
                  each week, including the patient's name, date of birth, OHIP number, date
                  of appointment or visit, and reason for visit.  Dr. Jackiewicz shall
                  maintain the original Patient Log and shall send a copy to the College at
                  the end of every calendar month;

            7.    Dr. Jackiewicz shall provide his Clinical Supervisor with full access to
                  his OHIP billings, his appointment scheduling book/program, and all
                  Patient Logs required to be maintained by Dr. Jackiewicz;

            8.    Dr. Jackiewicz shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor
                  to the College, and by the College to his Clinical Suprvisor, of all
                  information the Clinical Supervisor or the College deems necessary or
                  desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking and
                  to monitor Dr. Jackiewicz's compliance with this Order.  This shall
                  include, without limitation, providing the Clinical Supervisor with any
                  reports of any assessments of Dr. Jackiewicz's practice in the College's
                  possession;

            9.    If a Clinical Supervisor who has given an undertaking in Schedule "B" to
                  this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr.
                  Jackiewicz shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same,
                  obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly
                  qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is
                  delivered to the College within that time;

            10.   If Dr. Jackiewicz is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor in accordance
                  with paragraphs 1 or 8 of this Order, he shall cease practising medicine
                  immediately until such time as he has done so, and the fact that he has
                  will constitute a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of
                  registration until that time; 

            Monitoring

            11.   Dr. Jackiewicz shall, on an ongoing basis, provide the College with
                  addresses of all of the locations where he is practicing;

            12.   Dr. Jackiewicz shall submit to and not interfere with unannounced
                  inspections of his practice(s) and patient charts by a College
                  representative(s) for the purposes of monitoring and enforcing his
                  compliance with this Order; and

            13.   Dr. Jackiewicz shall give his irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor his
                  compliance with the terms of this Order. 

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Nov 2010
Summary:

On November 22, 2010, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Jackiewicz has committed an act of professional misconduct in that he 
failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and in that he engaged in conduct or 
an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional. 
 
Significant deficiencies were identified in Dr. Jackiewicz's obstetrical practice in relation to 
multiple patients and in his charting relating to both his obstetrical and gynaecological practices. 
Among other things, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Jackiewicz: 
 
a)    failed to follow accepted antenatal clinical practice in both low and high risk pregnancies, 
      such as failing to assess symphysis - fundal heights prior to 30 weeks; 
 
b)    failed to appropriately manage second stage labour by, for example, performing 
      unindicated operative vaginal deliveries; 
 
c)    failed to abandon in a timely manner operative vaginal deliveries if deliveries were not 
      forthcoming; 
 
d)    undertook high risk procedures such as trial of forceps and twin vaginal delivery in the 
      Labour and Delivery suite when they ought to have been done in an operating room; 
 
e)    failed to have the customary and necessary help available for planned high risk 
      procedures, such as a paediatrician, anaesthesiologist and operating room staff; 
 
f)    failed to conduct and document an adequate fetal assessment before and after performing 
      an external cephalic version; 
 
g)    failed to promptly assess a patient at risk of placental abruption when requested to do so 
      by nursing staff;  
 
h)    failed to adequately interpret the results of fetal heart rate tracing; and 
 
i)    failed to thoroughly inspect a patient's vagina following  post-partum hemhorraging. 
 
The Discipline Committee directed and ordered that: 
 
1.    Dr. Jackiewicz attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand 
      to be recorded on the Register; 
 
2.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Jackiewicz's 
      certificate of registration:    
 
      a.    For an indefinite period of time, Dr. Jackiewicz shall be prohibited from engaging 
            in the management of labour and delivery for all pregnancies with the following 
            exceptions: 
              
      i.    Dr. Jackiewicz shall be permitted to perform elective or 
            on-demand caesarean-section deliveries; and  
              
      ii.   Dr. Jackiewicz may act as a surgical assistant to other 
            hospital-based caesarean-sections when a College-approved 
            obstetrician is performing the caesarean-section as the most 
            responsible physician and is in attendance for the duration of the 
            procedure; 
              
b.    For an indefinite period of time, Dr. Jackiewicz shall inform all obstetrical 
      patients of the term, condition and limitation referenced in paragraph 3(a) 
      above;  
              
c.    Dr. Jackiewicz shall contact the College immediately to arrange at his own 
      expense to attend a program in communications that is satisfactory to the 
      College, which will involve multiple one-on-one sessions with a 
      College-approved instructor (the "Instructor"), incorporating principles of 
      counseling, guided reflection, tailored feedback, and other modalities 
      customized to the specific needs of Dr. Jackiewicz as assessed by the 
      Instructor.  The Instructor will make reports to the College regarding Dr. 
      Jackiewicz's progress and compliance and Dr. Jackiewicz shall 
      successfully complete this program;  
              
d.    With respect to his gynecological and office-obstetrical practices, Dr. 
      Jackiewicz shall, within 30 days from the date of this Order, retain a 
      College-approved clinical supervisor, who will sign an undertaking in the 
      form attached hereto as Schedule "A" (the "Supervisor"). For a period of 
      six months commencing on the day the Supervisor is retained, Dr. 
      Jackiewicz may practice only under the supervision of the Supervisor.  
      Upon completion of this period of supervision, Dr. Jackiewicz shall 
      undergo an assessment of his office-obstetrical and gynecological clinical 
      practices by a College-appointed assessor who has not previously assessed 
      Dr. Jackiewicz's practice in any respect.   This assessment will be limited 
      to determining if Dr. Jackiewicz is in compliance with this Order and 
      whether or not Dr. Jackiewicz's practice is below the standard of practice 
      of the profession.  The assessment may include a review of Dr. 
      Jackiewicz's hospital and office charts and interviews by the assessor.  
      The assessor shall report the results of this assessment to the College. 
              
e.    With respect to his practice of elective or on-demand caesarian-sections, 
      as set out in paragraph 3(a)(i) above, Dr. Jackiewicz shall advise the 
      College when and if he begins performing elective or on-demand 
      caesarian-sections and shall comply with the following conditions: 
              
      i.    for a period of six months commencing the date on which he 
            begins performing elective or on-demand caesarean-sections, Dr. 
                  Jackiewicz shall obtain a consultation for all proposed elective or 
                  on-demand caesarian-sections contemplated or performed, which 
                  consultation shall be documented on the patient chart.  This 
                  consultation will consider whether the elective or on-demand 
                  caesarian-section is appropriate; 
              
            ii.   for a period of six months commencing the date on which he 
                  begins performing elective or on-demand caesarean-sections, Dr. 
                  Jackiewicz shall practice only under the supervision of the 
                  Supervisor.  Upon completion of this period of supervision, Dr. 
                  Jackiewicz shall undergo an assessment of his elective or 
                  on-demand caesarian section clinical practice by the same assessor 
                  identified in paragraph 3(d) above or another College-appointed 
                  assessor who has not previously assessed Dr. Jackiewicz's practice 
                  in any respect.   This assessment will be limited to determining if 
                  Dr. Jackiewicz is in compliance with this Order and whether or not 
                  Dr. Jackiewicz's practice is below the standard of practice of the 
                  profession.  The assessment may include a review of Dr. 
                  Jackiewicz's hospital and office charts, interviews by the assessor 
                  and direct observation of Dr. Jackiewicz's patient care.  The 
                  assessor shall report the results of this assessment to the College; 
                  and 
              
            iii.  for eighteen months, after the period of supervision set out in 
                  paragraph 3(e)(ii) above is complete, Dr. Jackiewicz shall undergo 
                  a review every six months by the same assessor identified in 
                  paragraph 3(e)(ii) above or another College-appointed assessor 
                  who has not previously assessed Dr. Jackiewicz's practice in any 
                  respect, who shall: 
              
                  1.    review the files of up to thirty randomly selected patients 
                        for whom Dr. Jackiewicz has performed an elective or 
                        on-demand caesarian-section to determine whether the 
                        caesarean-sections were appropriate in the cases under 
                        review; and 
                  2.    report the results of this review to the College. 
              
      f.    Dr. Jackiewicz shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with 
            implementing the terms of this Order.  
              
3.    Dr. Jackiewicz shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in 
      the amount of $3,650.00. 
              
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 4, 2010

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)