Jackson, Steven Jacob (CPSO#: 63540)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (416) 438-6824
Fax: (416) 438-7006
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9401 Jane Street
Suite 101
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-6824
Fax: (416) 438-7006
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jackson ( CPSO# 63540 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Suite 101
9401 Jane Street
Maple ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (416) 438-6824

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN JACOB JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1991