Jacobs, David Avrum (CPSO#: 70312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Radiology
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TBRHSC
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Oxford Medical Imaging
1881 Yonge St #612
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 487-2425
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacobs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jacobs ( CPSO# 70312 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Radiology
1235 Wilson Avenue
Weston ON  M3M 0B2

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Bay
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
179 Gordon Road
Toronto ON  M2P 1E7
Phone Number: (416) 443-8625

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Imaging
100 - 4949 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M2R 1Y1
Phone Number: (416) 223-5460

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Imaging
LL03 - 7131 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  L4J 7Z1
Phone Number: (905) 889-2400

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Imaging
612 - 1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone Number: (416) 487-2425

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Imaging
100 - 11 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Phone Number: (416) 864-1814

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Imaging
520 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 260-1974

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Imaging
418 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 260-9382

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Imaging
D202 - 1105 Kingston Road
Toronto ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 420-3068

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Imaging
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Phone Number: (905) 836-2626

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Imaging
20A - 385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone Number: (519) 749-9555

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Imaging
23A - 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 569-8592

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Imaging
104 - 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 576-8760

Business Address:
Lighthouse Medical Imaging
LL04 - 4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 293-5940

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Finch Avenue Site
2111 Finch Avenue West
Downsview ON  M3N 1N1
Phone Number: (416) 744-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID AVRUM JACOBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOBS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 May 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002