Jacobs, Lawrence Jr (CPSO#: 86892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 252-9861 Ext. 1
Fax: (519) 915-5225
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence Jacobs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jacobs ( CPSO# 86892 )

Business Address:
202 - 2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 252-9861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE JR JACOBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOBS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011