Jacobs, Steve Roney (CPSO#: 53908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
586 Eglinton Avenue East, Suite 104
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone: (416) 485-947
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Jacobs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jacobs ( CPSO# 53908 )

Business Address:
600 - 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3342

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVE RONEY JACOBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOBS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1985