Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Jacques, Francois Henri (CPSO#: 59938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
147 Boulevard d'Europe
Gatineau QC  J9J 0A5
Phone: (819) 777-2500
Fax: (819) 777-2502
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Cowichan Way
Ottawa ON  K2H 7E6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Francois Jacques Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jacques ( CPSO# 59938 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
147 Boulevard D'Europe
Gatineau QC  J9J 0A5
Phone Number: (819) 777-2500

Business Address:
116 Boulevard Lionel Emond
Gatineau QC  J8Y 1W7
Phone Number: (819) 966-6200

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCOIS HENRI JACQUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACQUES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1989