Jadd, Jerome Lawrence (CPSO#: 55560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
469 William Street
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 235-0910
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Jadd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jadd ( CPSO# 55560 )

Business Address:
469 William Street
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-0910

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Huron Hospital Exeter

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEROME LAWRENCE JADD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JADD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1987