Jaidka, Rajesh Kumar (CPSO#: 59818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Dayanand Medical College, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 505
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 790-7400
Fax: (905) 794-1668
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.K. Jaidka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jaidka ( CPSO# 59818 )

Business Address:
505 - 2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 790-7400

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJESH KUMAR JAIDKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIDKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1989