Jaigobin, Cheryl Susheila (CPSO#: 65414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Krembil Neuroscience Centre
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 5th Floor Room 428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5960
Fax: (416) 603-5409
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cheryl Jaigobin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Jaigobin ( CPSO# 65414 )

Business Address:
Krembil Neuroscience Centre
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 5th Floor Room 428
399 Bathurst Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5960

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL SUSHEILA JAIGOBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIGOBIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993