Jain, Minto Kumar (CPSO#: 65424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
90 Cumberland Drive
Mississauga ON  L5G 3M8
Phone: (416) 710-2093
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MK Jain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 2 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MINTO KUMAR JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993