Jakobczyk, Jessica Kim (CPSO#: 90477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Queensland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nixon Medical Centre
510 Southdale Road East
Suite 301
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone: 519-690-2806
Fax: 519-690-0970
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 15910
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Jakobczyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jakobczyk ( CPSO# 90477 )

Business Address:
LHSC-Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Nixon Medical Centre
South London Pediatrics
301 - 510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone Number: (519) 690-2806

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA KIM JAKOBCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAKOBCZYK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2014 to 08 Mar 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2015