Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Jamal, Alykhan (CPSO#: 68090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East York Medical Health Centre
45 Overlea Boulevard Mall
Level Suite 27E
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Phone: (416) 696-9836 Ext. 222
Fax: (416) 696-7881
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jamal ( CPSO# 68090 )

Business Address:
East York Medical Health Centre
27E - 45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Phone Number: (416) 725-8945

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALYKHAN JAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996