Jamieson, Frances Berneice (CPSO#: 53993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Ontario Laboratories,
Public Health Ontario
661 University Ave
Ste 1701
Toronto ON  M5G 1M1
Phone: (647) 792-3169
Fax: (416) 649-4512
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roland Skrastins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Skrastins ( CPSO# 32352 )
Dr. F. Jamieson ( CPSO# 53993 )

Business Address:
The Respiratory Centre
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-7777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCES BERNEICE JAMIESON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMIESON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1987