Jamieson, Mary Anne (CPSO#: 62532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-6069
Fax: (613) 548-1330
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamieson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jamieson ( CPSO# 62532 )

Business Address:
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 4 76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-6069

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2

Business Address:
Lennox & Addington County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ANNE JAMIESON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMIESON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1992