Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Jardine, Julie Amanda (CPSO#: 69305)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
458 MacLaren St
2nd floor
Ottawa ON  K1R 5K6
Phone: 613 558-6627
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carleton Sports Medicine Clinic
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Canada
Phone: 6135203510
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.A. Jardine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jardine ( CPSO# 69305 )

Business Address:
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone Number: (613) 520-3510

Business Address:
2nd Floor
458 MacLaren Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 5K6
Phone Number: (613) 558-6627

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Oct 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE AMANDA JARDINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARDINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 27 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 28 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 27 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 28 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 27 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2001