Jardine, Lawrence Francis (CPSO#: 62081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Pediatric Hematology
Oncology - Childrens Hospital
B1-114
800 Commissioner's Road East
London ON  N6C 2V5
Phone: (519) 685-8494
Fax: (519) 685-8384
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence F. Jardine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jardine ( CPSO# 62081 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital, LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
B1-114
London ON  N6C 2V5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8494

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE FRANCIS JARDINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARDINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1999