Jay, Richard (CPSO#: 32270)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Jay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 33 Montrose Cres Markham ON L3R 7Z6
Date Received: 01 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017