Jayalath, Arachchige Dhanya Niroshini (CPSO#: 81781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:University of Colombo, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Eastern Avenue
Acton ON  L7J 0A5
Phone: (519) 853-4449
Fax: (519) 853-5242
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dhanya Jayalath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jayalath ( CPSO# 81781 )

Business Address:
Acton Medical Clinic and Urgent Care
10 Eastern Avenue
Acton ON  L7J 0A5
Phone Number: (519) 853-9997

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jul 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARACHCHIGE DHANYA NIROSHINI JAYALATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAYALATH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2004 to 20 Oct 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2004 to 03 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2006