Jeffries, Gregory Allan (CPSO#: 87123)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Department of Hospital Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Greg Jeffries Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jeffries ( CPSO# 87123 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY ALLAN JEFFRIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFFRIES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2010