Jeney, Elizabeth Victoria Maria (CPSO#: 53975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
1550 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9B 2L6
Phone: (905) 575-4429
Fax: (905) 575-4456
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Jeney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jeney ( CPSO# 53975 )

Business Address:
304 - 1550 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9B 2L6
Phone Number: (905) 575-4429

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 08 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH VICTORIA MARIA JENEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1988