Jeremic, Goran (CPSO#: 86836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 537-7509
Fax: (519) 537-8516
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Jeremic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jeremic ( CPSO# 86836 )

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 537-7509

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORAN JEREMIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEREMIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012