Jim, Harry (CPSO#: 50852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodbine Medical Centre
Building B Unit 9
76 Arlington Drive
Keswick ON  L4P 0A9
Phone: (905) 476-0308
Fax: (905) 476-1079
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Jim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jim ( CPSO# 50852 )

Business Address:
Woodbine Medical Centre
Building B Unit 9
76 Arlington Drive
Keswick ON  L4P 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 476-0308

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARRY JIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1991