Jimenez, Tomas Ygnacio (CPSO#: 81146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London East Medical Centre
295 Saskatoon Street
London ON  N5W 6A2
Phone: (519) 659-1122
Fax: (519) 659-8575
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tomas Jimenez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Jimenez ( CPSO# 81146 )

Business Address:
London East Medical Centre
295 Saskatoon Street
London ON  N5W 6A2
Phone Number: (519) 659-1122

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Nov 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TOMAS YGNACIO JIMENEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIMENEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 12 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2006